Aivar Auväärt
Business management timelineDropdown
Dropdown
Dropdown
02.04.2019 - 17.01.2020
Liquidator
......
Deleted
Deleted from the Business Register.
Krediidiskoor: 0.00
27.10.2015 - 22.06.2016
Liquidator of a member of the Management Board
......
Deleted
Deleted from the Business Register.
Krediidiskoor: 0.00
06.01.2014 - 02.04.2019
Board member
......
Deleted
Deleted from the Business Register.
Krediidiskoor: 0.00
06.01.2014 - 26.09.2014
Liquidator of a member of the Management Board
......
Deleted
Deleted from the Business Register.
Krediidiskoor: 0.00