Janek Teder
Business management timeline?
Dropdown
Dropdown
Dropdown
Aktiivne
Kustutatud
31.01.2022 - 12.07.2023
Board member
......
Risky
Company transferred to frontman.
Krediidiskoor: 0.99
Date of report 23.09.2024
★★★★
Date of birth: ......
Active relations: 5
Business experience from: : 14.05.2007
CONTACT
Harju maakond, Tallinn, Kesklinna linnaosa, Tartu mnt 80
janek@sfp.ee
+372 5157998
+372 6514370
+372 55648619
+372 5116800
+372 56672372
+372 56104959
31.01.2022 - 12.07.2023
Board member
......
Risky
Company transferred to frontman.
Krediidiskoor: 0.99
Company | Employees | Average gross salary |
---|
Company | Labor taxes paid | Employees | Turnover per employee | Profit Per Employee |
---|
Company | Beginning | Turnover | Taxed turnover | Labor productivity | Labor productivity | Number of employees |
---|
Company | Turnover | Assets | Liabilities | Equity | Net profit |
---|
Company | Beginning of representation | End of representation | Length of debt | Max debt | Debt balance |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
S.F.P. GROUP OÜ | 04.02.2011 | .. | ...... | ...... € | ...... € |
Debt balance total | ...... € |
Company | Turnover | Taxed turnover | Paid national taxes | Labor taxes paid | Number of employees |
---|
Companies | Beginning of representation | End of representation | Annual reports | Tax declarations |
---|
Total reports | |
---|---|
Submitted | |
Unsubmitted |
To expand your connections, log in to the "Networks" environment
To expand your connections, log in to the "Networks" environment
Neutral
Positive
Negative
No monitoring events were found
Failed to load monitoring events