Ian David Horsler
Business management timeline?
Dropdown
Dropdown
Dropdown
Aktiivne
Kustutatud
14.11.2011 - 22.10.2018
Board member
......
Risky
Company transferred to frontman.
Creditors were harmed.
Krediidiskoor: 0.99
Date of report 21.09.2024
★★★★
Date of birth: ......
Active relations: 1
Business experience from: : 26.09.2006
CONTACT
Harju maakond, Rae vald, Lagedi alevik, Jaama tn 5
ian@idhcap.com
+372 53481555
+372 55658795
+372 58535002
+372 55607069
14.11.2011 - 22.10.2018
Board member
......
Risky
Company transferred to frontman.
Creditors were harmed.
Krediidiskoor: 0.99
Company | Employees | Average gross salary |
---|
Company | Labor taxes paid | Employees | Turnover per employee | Profit Per Employee |
---|
Company | Beginning | Turnover | Taxed turnover | Labor productivity | Labor productivity | Number of employees |
---|
Company | Turnover | Assets | Liabilities | Equity | Net profit |
---|
Company | Beginning of representation | End of representation | Length of debt | Max debt | Debt balance |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAIG ESTONIA OÜ | 14.11.2011 | 22.10.2018 | ...... | ...... € | ...... € |
IDH GROUP OÜ | 29.09.2011 | 07.03.2024 | ...... | ...... € | ...... € |
REFERENTS MANUFACTURING OÜ | 16.10.2018 | 08.03.2024 | ...... | ...... € | ...... € |
Debt balance total | ...... € |
Company | Turnover | Taxed turnover | Paid national taxes | Labor taxes paid | Number of employees |
---|
Companies | Beginning of representation | End of representation | Annual reports | Tax declarations |
---|
Total reports | |
---|---|
Submitted | |
Unsubmitted |
To expand your connections, log in to the "Networks" environment
To expand your connections, log in to the "Networks" environment
Neutral
Positive
Negative
No monitoring events were found
Failed to load monitoring events