Tarmo Erlich
Business management timeline?
Dropdown
Dropdown
Dropdown
Aktiivne
Kustutatud
06.02.2015 - 22.06.2020
Board member
......
Risky
Company transferred to frontman.
Krediidiskoor: 0.99
Date of report 21.09.2024
★★★★
Date of birth: ......
Active relations: 1
Business experience from: : 22.05.2005
CONTACT
Tartu maakond, Kambja vald, Läti küla, Tamme
+372 5230838
06.02.2015 - 22.06.2020
Board member
......
Risky
Company transferred to frontman.
Krediidiskoor: 0.99
Company | Employees | Average gross salary |
---|
Company | Labor taxes paid | Employees | Turnover per employee | Profit Per Employee |
---|
Company | Beginning | Turnover | Taxed turnover | Labor productivity | Labor productivity | Number of employees |
---|
Company | Turnover | Assets | Liabilities | Equity | Net profit |
---|
Company | Beginning of representation | End of representation | Length of debt | Max debt | Debt balance |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
DORPAT KINNISVARA OÜ | 22.05.2005 | 27.10.2015 | ...... | ...... € | ...... € |
ALFAGAS OÜ | 27.03.2012 | 19.06.2019 | ...... | ...... € | ...... € |
KOHL OÜ | 06.02.2015 | 22.06.2020 | ...... | ...... € | ...... € |
ACM SERVICE OÜ | 04.09.2019 | 14.09.2022 | ...... | ...... € | ...... € |
Debt balance total | ...... € |
Company | Turnover | Taxed turnover | Paid national taxes | Labor taxes paid | Number of employees |
---|
Companies | Beginning of representation | End of representation | Annual reports | Tax declarations |
---|
Total reports | |
---|---|
Submitted | |
Unsubmitted |
To expand your connections, log in to the "Networks" environment
To expand your connections, log in to the "Networks" environment
Neutral
Positive
Negative
No monitoring events were found
Failed to load monitoring events