Romet Kõiv
Business management timelineDropdown
Dropdown
Dropdown
31.10.2018 - 19.11.2021
Board member
......
Deleted
Unsubmitted annual reports.
Deleted from the Business Register.
Joining with network of frontmen: SORENTOSAN UÜ (19.11.2021).
Krediidiskoor: 0.00
20.04.2018 - 13.04.2020
Board member
......
Deleted
Company transferred to frontman.
Joining with network of frontmen: CONSULTFUND UÜ (29.05.2020).
Krediidiskoor: 0.00